EP0105407 - A sputtering cathode apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.1989 [1989/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Products Corporation 100 West 10th Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [1984/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hope, Lawrence L. 402 Taylor Road Stow, MA / US | 02 /
Davey, Ernest A. 11 Esquire Drive Peabody, MA / US | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Lemke, Jörg-Michael Jung HML Patentanwälte Hofmarkstrasse 10 - Arnhofen 86447 Aindling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Schmiedstrasse 1, Hausen D-86447 Aindling / DE | ||
Former [1984/16] | Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Orthstrasse 12 D-8000 München 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109357.0 | 20.09.1983 | [1984/16] | Priority number, date | US19820431958 | 30.09.1982 Original published format: US 431958 | [1984/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0105407 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0105407 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105407 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/34 | [1984/16] | CPC: |
H01J37/3408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1984/16] | Title | German: | Kathodenzerstäubungsgerät | [1984/16] | English: | A sputtering cathode apparatus | [1984/16] | French: | Appareil de pulvérisation cathodique | [1984/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.09.1983 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 03.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8202725 (SHATTERPROOF GLASS CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0014819 (ADVANCED COATING TECH [US]); | [A]DE2707144 (SLOAN TECHNOLOGY CORP); | [A]EP0045822 (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) |