EP0106212 - Roll mode for cached data storage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartung, Michael Howard 3865 N Tanuri Drive Tucson Arizona 85715 / US | 02 /
Nolta, Arthur Herbert 9161 E. Placita Senna Tucson Arizona 85715 / US | 03 /
Reed, David Gordon 1920 N 49er Drive Tucson Arizona 85715 / US | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1986/19] | Appleton, John Edward IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1984/17] | Lancaster, James Donald IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester, Hants, S021 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 83109476.8 | 23.09.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | US19820433599 | 08.10.1982 Original published format: US 433599 | [1984/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0106212 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0106212 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106212 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
G06F12/0866 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/17] | G11C9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/17] | Title | German: | Rollenmodus für gepufferte Datenspeicher | [1984/17] | English: | Roll mode for cached data storage | [1984/17] | French: | Mode de roulement pour mémoire de données à antémémoire | [1984/17] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 24.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0037459 (IBM [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 12, May 1982, pages 6605,6606, New York, US; A.H. NOLTA et al.: "Dynamically maintained command chains" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 4, September 1982, pages 2079,2080, New York, US; A.H. NOLTA et al.: "Batching DASD accesses in a multi-user environment" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 4, September 1982, pages 2077,2078, New York, US; D.G. REED et al.: "Priming cache memories for rapid data transfers" |