Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0106212 | Global Dossier | 04.04.1990 | B1 | EP0106212 | 18.03.1987 | A3 | EP0106212 | 25.04.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US43359982 | 08.10.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1197021 | 19.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US43359982 | 08.10.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3381419D1 | 10.05.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US43359982 | 08.10.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK138594 | 16.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US43359982 | 08.10.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0532764B | 17.05.1993 | B2 | JPS5966755 | 16.04.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US43359982 | 08.10.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4583166 | 15.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US43359982 | 08.10.1982 |