EP0104640 - Sintered apatite bodies and composites thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 6 Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-Shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 6 Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-Shi Aichi / JP | ||
Former [1984/14] | For all designated states INA SEITO CO., LTD 3-6 Koiehon-Machi Tokoname Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatahira, Seiichi No. 207-12, 4-chome Hiiragicho Handa-shi Aichi / JP | [1984/14] | Representative(s) | Deufel, Paul, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | Deufel, Paul, Dr., et al Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109582.3 | 26.09.1983 | [1984/14] | Priority number, date | JP19820167013 | 25.09.1982 Original published format: JP 16701382 | JP19820191347 | 30.10.1982 Original published format: JP 19134782 | US19830489520 | 28.04.1983 Original published format: US 489520 | [1984/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0104640 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0104640 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0104640 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/64, C04B35/00, C04B35/80, // A61F2/02 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
C04B35/447 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/28 (EP,US);
A61L27/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/425 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (KR);
|
Former IPC [1984/14] | C04B35/64, C04B35/00, C04B35/80, // A61F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/14] | Title | German: | Gesinterter Apatitkörper und Verbundmaterialien davon | [1984/14] | English: | Sintered apatite bodies and composites thereof | [1984/14] | French: | Corps frittés en apatite et leurs composites | [1984/14] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/05] | 29.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP55130854 ; | [A]GB1487181 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [A]US4149894 (EBIHARA MASATOMI, et al); | [X]GB1550330 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [A]EP0026090 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 22, June 1981, page 296, no. 179537w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-55 130 854 (MITSUBISHI MINING AND CEMENT CO., LTD.) 11-10-1980, & JP55130854 A 00000000 | [A] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 46, 1979, pages 213-220, North-Holland Publishing Co., Amsterdam, NL; J. ARENDS et al.: "Preparation of pure hydroxyapatite single crystals by hydrothermal recrystallization" | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 4, January 1983, page 259, no. 21088y, Columbus, Ohio, US; K. HIROTA et al.: "Densification of hydroxylapatite by hot isostatic pressing" & YOGYO KYOKAISHI 1982, 90(11), 680-2 |