EP0107091 - Stereo television system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1991 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackman, Earle G. 15810 - 228th Avenue Elk River Minnesota 55330 / US | 02 /
Hughes, Frank J. 7204 Glouchester Drive Edina Minnesota 55435 / US | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Rentzsch, Heinz, et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 63008 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109671.4 | 28.09.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | US19820437088 | 27.10.1982 Original published format: US 437088 | US19820426503 | 29.09.1982 Original published format: US 426503 | [1984/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0107091 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0107091 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107091 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
H04N13/337 (EP);
H04N13/189 (EP);
H04N13/218 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/18] | H04N9/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/18] | Title | German: | Stereofernsehsystem | [1984/18] | English: | Stereo television system | [1984/18] | French: | Système de télévision en stéréo | [1984/18] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 20.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3992573 ; | [Y]FR1010147 | [A] - ELECTRONICS, vol. 1, no. 6, 18th March 1968, pages 132,133, New York, US; M.G. MAXWELL: "Cameras that wink can produce 3-D tv" |