EP0106234 - Use of amine salts of maleamic acid as corrosion inhibitors of C02 and H2S in water in oil emulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oppenlaender, Knut, Dr. Otto-Dill-Strasse 23 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Stork, Karl, Dr. Reutersgarten 1 D-6840 Lampertheim / DE | 03 /
Barthold, Klaus, Dr. Paulusbergstrasse 4 D-6800 Mannheim 51 / DE | [1984/17] | Application number, filing date | 83109734.0 | 29.09.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | DE19823237109 | 07.10.1982 Original published format: DE 3237109 | [1984/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0106234 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106234 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/22, E21B41/02, C23F11/14 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
C09K8/54 (EP);
C10M133/16 (EP);
C23F11/145 (EP);
C10M2201/02 (EP);
C10M2215/12 (EP);
C10N2030/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/17] | C10M1/36, E21B41/02, C23F11/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/17] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Aminsalzen von Maleinamidsäuren als Inhibitoren gegen die Korrosion von CO2 und H2S in Wasser-in-Öl-Emulsionen | [1984/17] | English: | Use of amine salts of maleamic acid as corrosion inhibitors of C02 and H2S in water in oil emulsions | [1984/17] | French: | Utilisation de sels d'amines d'amide de l'acide maléique comme inhibiteur de corrosion de C02 et H2S dans des émulsions eau dans l'huile | [1984/17] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 22.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0002780 ; | [A]FR2427400 (SNAM PROGETTI [IT]); | [A]EP0065191 (BASF AG [DE]); | [AD]DE1149843 (SOCONY MOBIL OIL CO INC) |