EP0107806 - Process for preparing optically active derivatives of hydroquinone and d-alpha-tocopherol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1990 [1990/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barner, Richard, Dr. In den Reben 97 CH-4108 Witterswil / CH | 02 /
Hübscher, Josef, Dr. Spausel 1080 CH-5703 Seon / CH | [1984/19] | Representative(s) | Urech, Peter, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | Urech, Peter, Dr., et al Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1984/19] | Cottong, Norbert A. Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 83109791.0 | 30.09.1983 | [1984/19] | Priority number, date | CH19820006270 | 27.10.1982 Original published format: CH 627082 | [1984/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107806 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107806 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/72, C07D303/32, C07D303/26, C07C43/23, C07C41/26 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
C07D303/22 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
C07C46/02 (EP,US);
C07C50/28 (EP,US);
C07D303/32 (EP,US);
C07D311/72 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C46/02, C07C50/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von optisch aktiven Hydrochinonderivaten sowie von d-alpha-Tocopherol | [1984/19] | English: | Process for preparing optically active derivatives of hydroquinone and d-alpha-tocopherol | [1984/19] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de dérivés optiquement actifs d'hydroquinone et du tocophérol | [1984/19] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1983 | Examination requested [1984/19] | 12.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0058945 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Band 46, Nr. 12, 5. Juni 1981, Seiten 2445-2450, American Chemical Society, US, N. COHEN et al.: "Studies on the total synthesis of (2R,4'R,8'R)-alpha-tocopherol (vitamin E). Stereospecific cyclizations leading to optically active chromans". |