Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0105514


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.01.1987 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.03.1987 [1987/13]
14.02.1986 (Expected) grant published on  02.04.1986 [1986/14]
07.02.1985 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.1985 [1985/15]
19.06.1984 Publication of search report published on  22.08.1984 [1984/34]
18.02.1984 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.04.1984 [1984/16]