blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0105514

EP0105514 - Device for securing building shafts against breakage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.1987
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.03.1987 [1987/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baum, Albert
Österreicherstrasse 10
D-8752 Goldbach / DE
[1984/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1984/16]
Representative(s)Grams, Klaus Dieter, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/16]Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date83109867.803.10.1983
[1984/16]
Priority number, dateDE1982323665504.10.1982         Original published format: DE 3236655
[1984/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0105514
Date:18.04.1984
Language:DE
[1984/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0105514
Date:22.08.1984
Language:DE
[1984/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0105514
Date:02.04.1986
Language:DE
[1986/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.1984
ClassificationIPC:E06B9/01
[1984/16]
CPC:
E06B9/01 (EP); E06B2009/015 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   GB,   LI,   NL [1984/16]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Sicherung von Bauwerkschächten gegen Aufbruch[1984/16]
English:Device for securing building shafts against breakage[1984/16]
French:Dispositif pour la consolidation des puits de bâtiment contre l'effraction[1984/16]
Examination procedure23.01.1985Examination requested  [1985/15]
26.08.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
04.10.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.1986Fee for grant paid
02.01.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.01.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AP]DE8225874U  ;
 [AD]DE2932205  ;
 [A]US2125807  ;
 [A]US2292954
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.