EP0109521 - Apparatus for coating a moving web of material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAGENBERG Aktiengesellschaft Kennedydamm 15-17 D-40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [1984/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sommer, Herbert Marschner Strasse 16 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Wohlfeil, Gerhard Habichtstrasse 7 D-4019 Monheim / DE | [1984/22] | Representative(s) | Pfeiffer, Helmut c/o Jagenberg AG Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | Pfeiffer, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Jagenberg AG Kennedydamm 15-17 D-40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109879.3 | 04.10.1983 | [1984/22] | Priority number, date | DE19823243317 | 23.11.1982 Original published format: DE 3243317 | DE19833305966 | 21.02.1983 Original published format: DE 3305966 | [1984/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0109521 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109521 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B05C11/04, B05C11/02 | [1984/22] | CPC: |
D06B15/08 (EP);
B05C11/023 (EP);
B05C5/0254 (EP);
B05C9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Beschichten laufender Materialbahnen | [1984/22] | English: | Apparatus for coating a moving web of material | [1984/22] | French: | Dispositif pour l'enduction d'une bande de matériau en mouvement | [1987/03] |
Former [1984/22] | Dispositif pour l'enduction d'une bande de matériau courante | Examination procedure | 30.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/41] | 07.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2359413 [ ]; | DE2845036 [ ] (JAGENBERG WERKE AG); | DE1652280 [ ] (BRITTAINS LTD) |