EP0106267 - Apparatus for the diagnosis of body structures into which a gamma-emitting radioactive isotope has been introduced [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drukier, Andrzej Kamil Rümannstrasse 53 D-8000 Munich 40 / DE | [1984/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/17] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys.Rotermund B.Sc. Morgan, Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109924.7 | 04.10.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | GB19820028232 | 04.10.1982 Original published format: GB 8228232 | [1984/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0106267 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0106267 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/164, G01T1/29 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
G01T1/1642 (EP,US);
A61B6/4258 (EP,US);
G01T1/2008 (EP,US);
G01T1/2921 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/17] | G01T1/161, G01T1/20, G01N23/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1984/29] |
Former [1984/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die Diagnose von Körperteilen, in die ein Gammastrahlung emittierendes radioaktives Isotop eingeführt wurde | [1984/17] | English: | Apparatus for the diagnosis of body structures into which a gamma-emitting radioactive isotope has been introduced | [1984/17] | French: | Appareil de diagnostic de parties du corps dans lequel a été introduit un isotope radioactif émettant des rayons gamma | [1984/17] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 05.01.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, IT, LU, NL, SE | 21.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 26.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/33] | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/33] | Request for further processing for: | 12.04.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.05.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 04.11.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 04.11.1983 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   02.01.1984 | 04.11.1983 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   02.01.1984 | 04.11.1983 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   02.01.1984 | 04.11.1983 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   02.01.1984 | 04.11.1983 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 04.11.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 04.11.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 04.11.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1987 | 31.10.1988 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.1989 | 31.10.1989 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.1990 | 31.10.1990 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4247774 (BROOKS RODNEY A); | [Y]GB958240 (PHILIPS ELECTRICAL IND LTD); | [A]US3581087 (BRINKERHOFF JORIS M, et al); | [A]US4029963 (ALVAREZ ROBERT E, et al) |