EP0108265 - Method and apparatus for the surveillance of the reactivity rate of a core in a nuclear reactor and for the diagnosis of changes in the core reactivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.1990 [1990/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERATOM Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [1987/38] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states INTERATOM Internationale Atomreaktorbau GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holick, Anton, Dipl.-Phys. Steinstrasse 10 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach / DE | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/20] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110019.3 | 06.10.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | DE19823238522 | 18.10.1982 Original published format: DE 3238522 | [1984/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108265 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108265 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108265 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/10 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
G21C17/00 (EP);
G21C17/104 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/20] | G21C7/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der Reaktivitätsbilanz des Core eines Kernreaktors und zur Diagnose von Reaktivitätsstörungen | [1984/20] | English: | Method and apparatus for the surveillance of the reactivity rate of a core in a nuclear reactor and for the diagnosis of changes in the core reactivity | [1984/20] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la surveillance du bilan neutronique du coeur d'un réacteur nucléaire et pour le diagnostic du changement de la réactivité | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 06.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2192318 (ATOMIC ENERGY COMMISSION [US]); | [A]FR2004090 (EURATOM [BE]); | [APD]EP0065155 (INTERATOM [DE]) | [AD] - IAEA-SM-244/28, September 1979, Seiten 429-446; J.C. GAUTHIER et al.: "Comparateur de reactivite" | [AP] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUTOMATIC CONTROL, Band AC-28, Nr. 3, März 1983, Seiten 406-415, IEEE, New York, US; J.L. TYLEE: "On-line failure detection in nuclear power plant instrumentation" |