EP0111107 - Device for conveying containers filled with cigarettes to a packaging machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.1987 [1987/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Fr. Niepmann GmbH & Co. Bahnhofstrasse 21 D-58285 Gevelsberg / DE | [1984/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brinker, Alfred Dr. Am Jägerhaus 19 D-5820 Gevelsberg / DE | 02 /
Pitz, Hans Peter Hagener Strasse 36 D-5820 Gevelsberg / DE | 03 /
Stewart, Iain Graham In den Birken 168 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1984/25] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110317.1 | 15.10.1983 | [1984/25] | Priority number, date | DE19823241558 | 10.11.1982 Original published format: DE 3241558 | [1984/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111107 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111107 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/352 | [1984/25] | CPC: |
A24C5/352 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Zufuhr von mit Zigaretten gefüllten Schragen zu einer Zigaretten-Packmaschine | [1984/25] | English: | Device for conveying containers filled with cigarettes to a packaging machine | [1984/25] | French: | Dispositif pour le transport de récipients remplis de cigarettes vers une machine d'empaquetage | [1984/25] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 28.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2018442 ; | [A]DE1481364 (MOLINS MACHINE CO LTD); | [A]FR1548868 ; | [A]DE2107825 |