EP0118592 - Tensile strength cable incorporating an optical fibre sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1987 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Felten & Guilleaume Energietechnik AG Postfach 80 50 01 D-51058 Köln / DE | [1987/13] |
Former [1984/38] | For all designated states Felten & Guilleaume Energietechnik GmbH Schanzenstrasse 24-30 Postfach 80 50 01 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levacher, Friedrich Karl, Dr. Medardusstrasse 24 D-5024 P. Brauweiler / DE | 02 /
Federmann, Helmut, Dr. Holunderweg 17 D-5060 Berg. Gladbach / DE | [1984/38] | Application number, filing date | 83110453.4 | 20.10.1983 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | DE19833305234 | 16.02.1983 Original published format: DE 3305234 | [1984/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118592 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118592 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0118592 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/08, G01B11/16 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
G01M11/086 (EP,US);
G01B11/18 (EP,US);
G01L1/245 (EP,US);
G02B6/4432 (EP,US);
G08B13/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/38] | Title | German: | Zugfester Draht mit eingeschlossenem Lichtwellenleiter-Sensor | [1984/38] | English: | Tensile strength cable incorporating an optical fibre sensor | [1984/38] | French: | Câble à limite d'élasticité avec fibre optique sensible incorporée | [1984/38] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/51] | 25.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.06.1986 | [2003/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2058394 (MARCONI CO LTD); | [AD]DE3112422 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [XP]EP0082820 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]) |