EP0110100 - Holder and socket for picture tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1987 [1987/32] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
International Standard Electric Corporation 320 Park Avenue New York New York 10022 / US | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
International Standard Electric Corporation 320 Park Avenue New York New York 10022 / US | ||
For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunn, Otto Lindenstrasse 55 D-7314 Wernau / DE | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Pohl, Herbert, et al Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Pohl, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing, et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110459.1 | 20.10.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | DE19823239691 | 27.10.1982 Original published format: DE 3239691 | [1984/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0110100 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110100 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01R33/76 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
H01J29/92 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/24] | Title | German: | Fassung und Sockel für Bildröhren | [1984/24] | English: | Holder and socket for picture tubes | [1984/24] | French: | Douille et socle pour des tubes d'images | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 09.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3916238 (SUZUKI MINORU); | [A]US4075531 (MARINO ARMANDO V); | [A]EP0050574 (METALLO STE FSE [FR]) |