EP0111684 - Novel process for making n-butyl butyrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPC INTERNATIONAL INC. International Plaza P.O. Box 8000 Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | For all designated states CPC INTERNATIONAL INC. International Plaza P.O. Box 8000 Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heady, Robert E. 226 Tampa Park Forest Illinois 60466 / US | 02 /
Alonso, Jorge H. 7 Azalea Lane Montvale New Jersey 07645 / US | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110650.5 | 25.10.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | US19820442807 | 18.11.1982 Original published format: US 442807 | [1984/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111684 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111684 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/62, // C12R1/145 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
C12P7/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von n-Butylbutyrat | [1984/26] | English: | Novel process for making n-butyl butyrate | [1984/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation de butyrate de n-butyle | [1984/26] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 28.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/07] | 14.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB453524 (HAROLD EDWIN POTTS); | [A]GB578279 (MAX SULZBACHER); | [A]US2474170 (MAX SULZBACHER) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 46, 1952, abstract no. 3211b, Columbus, Ohio, US |