blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0111696

EP0111696 - An arrangement for the removal of one or more fractions out of whole blood, plasma or other similar body fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.1988
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.1989Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.03.1989 [1989/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
Box 10101
S-220 10 Lund / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Larsson, Lars-Ake Lennart
Odlarevägen 66
S-240 21 Löddeköpinge / SE
02 / Nilsson, Ake Wallys
Inspektorsgatan 8
S-244 00 Kävlinge / SE
03 / Johansson, Bo Ingemar Willy
Lokföraregatan 3 D
S-222 37 Lund / SE
04 / Nauclér, Lars Olof Vilhelm
Olshögsvägen 6
S-223 60 Lund / SE
[1984/26]
Representative(s)Boberg, Nils Gunnar Erik
Gambro AB Patent Department Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]Boberg, Nils Gunnar Erik
Gambro AB Patent Department Box 10101
S-220 10 Lund / SE
Application number, filing date83110796.628.10.1983
[1984/26]
Priority number, dateSE1982000707810.12.1982         Original published format: SE 8207078
[1984/26]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0111696
Date:27.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0111696
Date:25.07.1984
Language:EN
[1984/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0111696
Date:07.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1984
ClassificationIPC:A61M1/34
[1988/01]
CPC:
A61M1/3679 (EP,US); A61M1/3472 (EP,US); A61M1/3486 (EP,US);
A61M2205/707 (EP,US); A61M2205/7554 (EP,US); A61M2205/7581 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1984/26]A61M1/03
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1984/26]
TitleGerman:Anordnung zum Entfernen einer oder mehrerer Fraktionen aus Gesamtblut, Plasma oder anderen ähnlichen Körperflüssigkeiten[1984/26]
English:An arrangement for the removal of one or more fractions out of whole blood, plasma or other similar body fluids[1984/26]
French:Agencement pour l'élimination d'une ou plusieurs fractions du sang, du plasma ou d'autres liquides similaires du corps humain[1984/26]
Examination procedure14.01.1985Examination requested  [1985/16]
24.04.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.12.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.1987Fee for grant paid
20.01.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.01.1988
[1989/13]
Documents cited:Search[A]US4043501  (LARRABEE EDWARD WHITTUM, et al);
 [A]US4127111  (DROLET ROLAND A);
 [A]EP0046470  (STOLLE RES & DEV [US]);
 [A]WO8203331  (BIOLOG & INTERFERON PROD INC [US])
 [XD]  - BLOOD, vol. 58, no. 1, July 1981, pages 38-44
Examination   - BLOOD, vol. 58, no. 1, July 1981, pages 38-44, I.M. NILSSON et al.: "A procedure for removing high titer antibodies by extracorporeal protein-A-sepharose adsorption in hemophilia: Substitution therpy and surgery in a patient with hemophilia B and antiobodies"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.