EP0114214 - Device for the releasable clamping of rope-shaped material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adomeit, Heinz-Dieter, Dr.-Ing Grolmanstrasse 16 D-10623 Berlin / DE | [1984/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111003.6 | 04.11.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | DE19823246638 | 16.12.1982 Original published format: DE 3246638 | [1984/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0114214 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/02 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
A44B11/12 (EP,US);
F16G11/101 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3936 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3938 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3944 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3956 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum lösbaren Festklemmen eines strangförmigen Materials | [1984/31] | English: | Device for the releasable clamping of rope-shaped material | [1984/31] | French: | Dispositif pour serrer de manière détachable un matériel en forme de corde | [1984/31] | File destroyed: | 02.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 20.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/31] | 04.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2752860 [ ] (ALLIED CHEM); | DE3001758 [ ] (TAKATA KOJYO CO); | DE3110068 [ ] (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | DE2432956 [ ] |