EP0115576 - Assembly for developing light tube systems or spatial structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.10.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1987 | Refusal of application | published on 16.12.1987 [1987/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kotzolt, Günter Lagesche Strasse 72-74 D-4920 Lemgo 1 / DE | [1984/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 D-33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111062.2 | 05.11.1983 | [1984/33] | Priority number, date | DE19830000417U | 08.01.1983 Original published format: DE 8300417 U | [1984/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0115576 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0115576 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F21S3/14 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
F21S2/00 (EP,US);
E04B1/34384 (EP,US);
F21V21/005 (EP,US);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/33] | Title | German: | Bausatz zur Herstellung von Lichtrohrsystemen oder Raumfachwerken | [1984/33] | English: | Assembly for developing light tube systems or spatial structures | [1984/33] | French: | Eléments pour le montage de bandes lumineuses ou de structures tridimensionnelles | [1984/33] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 12.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/48] | 15.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1987/51] | 02.08.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE458442 (ELEKTROTECHNISCHE FABRIK HELIO); | [X]GB338408 (THOMAS PROSSER HINGLEY); | [A]US2945202 (RONEY RAYMOND B, et al); | [AD]EP0018005 (KOTZOLT GUENTER) |