Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0109033 | Global Dossier | 06.11.1985 | A3 | EP0109033 | 23.05.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US44334482 | 15.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS59122435 | 14.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US44334482 | 15.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4461915 | 24.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US44334482 | 15.11.1982 |