EP0109038 - Communication terminal for an office information system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANG LABORATORIES INC. One Industrial Avenue Lowell, MA 01851 / US | [1984/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, An Bedford Road Lincoln, MA / US | 02 /
Fry, Stanley Bruce RD No. 1 Wilton New Hampshire / US | 03 /
Ho, Shu Kuang 56 Nowell Farm Road Carlisle, MA / US | 04 /
Smutek, John Michael 21 Belmont Road Billerica, MA / US | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111155.4 | 08.11.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | US19820440668 | 10.11.1982 Original published format: US 440668 | [1984/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0109038 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0109038 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/21 | [1984/21] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04N1/3871 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/21] | Title | German: | Kommunikationsterminal für ein Büroinformationssystem | [1984/21] | English: | Communication terminal for an office information system | [1984/21] | French: | Terminal de communication pour un système d'information de bureau | [1984/21] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 08.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/37] | 30.03.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/37] | Appeal following examination | 25.09.1991 | Appeal received No. T0116/92 | 25.11.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.03.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 30.03.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.1993 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 13.12.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2813687 (OLYMPIA WERKE AG); | [A]US4196450 (MAGINNESS MAXWELL G [US], et al); | [A]GB2078411 (SONY CORP); | [XP]FR2513781 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |