EP0109064 - Hydrocarbon conversion catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO. Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO. Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, Grant Campbell 812 Brantford Avenue Silver Spring Maryland 20904 / US | 02 /
Welsh, William Alan 12550 Hall Shop Road Fulton Maryland 20759 / US | 03 /
Peters, Alan Winthrop 4313 Prince Road Rockville Maryland 20853 / US | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111257.8 | 11.11.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | US19820442117 | 16.11.1982 Original published format: US 442117 | [1984/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0109064 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0109064 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/08, C10G11/05, C10G45/12 | [1984/21] | CPC: |
C10G49/08 (EP);
B01J29/084 (EP);
C10G11/05 (EP);
C10G2300/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/21] | Title | German: | Kohlenwasserstoffumwandlungskatalysator | [1984/21] | English: | Hydrocarbon conversion catalysts | [1984/21] | French: | Catalyseur de conversion d'hydrocarbures | [1984/21] | File destroyed: | 30.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 14.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/34] | 25.03.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4333859 ; | [Y]GB2007107 ; | [E]EP0083163 |