EP0118602 - Device for dyeing easter eggs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salus-Haus Dr. Med. Otto Greither Bahnhofstrasse 24 D-8206 Bruckmühl/Mangfall / DE | [1984/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greither, Otto, Dr. Berghamerstrasse 7 D-8206 Bruckmühl/Mangfall / DE | [1984/38] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111297.4 | 11.11.1983 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | DE19830003853U | 11.02.1983 Original published format: DE 8303853 U | [1984/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118602 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B44D3/00, B44D3/22, B44D3/12, A23L1/275 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
B65D85/808 (EP);
A23L5/43 (EP);
B44D2/00 (EP);
B44D3/00 (EP);
B44D3/12 (EP);
B44D3/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, LI, LU, NL [1984/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Färben von Ostereiern | [1984/38] | English: | Device for dyeing easter eggs | [1984/38] | French: | Dispositif pour colorier des oeufs de Pâques | [1984/38] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 26.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4370941 ; | [Y]CH209650 ; | [A]US4181745 ; | [A]DE868862 ; | [A]DE1570015 ; | [A]DE172289 |