Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
27.11.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.1986 [1986/05] |
04.09.1984 | Publication of search report | published on 07.11.1984 [1984/45] |
16.04.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.06.1984 [1984/24] |