EP0110226 - Internal combustion engine control system with means for reshaping of command derived from accelerator control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIKUNI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-11, Sotokanda 6-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states MIKUNI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-11, Sotokanda 6-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasumi, Kazuhisa 4-6-17 Koyawata Odawara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Takashi 649 Kamiohi Ohimachi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111355.0 | 14.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | US19820446385 | 02.12.1982 Original published format: US 446385 | [1984/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0110226 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0110226 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F02D33/02, F02D11/10 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
F02D11/105 (EP,US);
F02D41/2422 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/24] | Title | German: | Steuersystem für Innenbrennkraftmaschinen und Mittel zur Ableitung eines Steuersignals aus der Gaspedalstellung | [1984/24] | English: | Internal combustion engine control system with means for reshaping of command derived from accelerator control | [1984/24] | French: | Système de commande pour moteur à combustion interne comprenant des moyens pour préformer la commande dérivée de la pédale d'accélérateur | [1984/24] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/05] | 09.08.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3028601 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]); | [Y]GB2041579 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]GB2068456 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | [AP]DE3205556 (PIERBURG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |