EP0114227 - Adjusting process for the axial elasticity of a mechanical sealing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1987 [1987/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOETZE AG Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 17 D-51399 Burscheid / DE | [1984/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Treiber, Hartmut, Dr. Feldhauserweg 12 D-4018 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
Deuring, Hans Im Eulenflug 29 D-5093 Burscheid / DE | [1984/31] | Application number, filing date | 83111399.8 | 15.11.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | DE19823247980 | 24.12.1982 Original published format: DE 3247980 | [1984/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0114227 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114227 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34, F01P5/10 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
F04D29/126 (EP);
F16J15/346 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einstellen der axialen Federkraft der Einbaueinheit einer Gleitringdichtung | [1984/31] | English: | Adjusting process for the axial elasticity of a mechanical sealing unit | [1984/31] | French: | Procédé de réglage de l'élasticité axiale d'une unité de montage d'un joint à bagues frottantes | [1984/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 17.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2797940 (MICHENER JR HERBERT E, et al) |