EP0111760 - Trailer train with constrained steering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fahrzeugwerk Orthaus GmbH & Co. KG Harmate 20 D-4422 Ahaus-Wüllen / DE | [1988/12] |
Former [1984/26] | For all designated states Orthaus, Dieter Kaland 28 D-4422 Ahaus-Wüllen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orthaus, Dieter Kaland 28 D-4422 Ahaus-Wüllen / DE | [1988/12] |
Former [1984/26] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Schulte, Jörg Schulte & Schulte Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | Schulte, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 2 D-45219 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111490.5 | 17.11.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | DE19823246572 | 16.12.1982 Original published format: DE 3246572 | [1984/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111760 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111760 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B62D13/02, B60D1/14 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
B60D1/173 (EP);
B62D13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/26] | Title | German: | Lastzug mit Zwangslenkung | [1984/26] | English: | Trailer train with constrained steering | [1984/26] | French: | Camion-remorque à direction forcée | [1984/26] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/07] | 01.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1019850 ; | [Y]US2124947 (HENDERSON ROBERT D); | [A]US2792238 (SCHAA MARVIN J); | [A]CH570294 (VETTER HANS); | [Y]DE2808173 (ACKERMANN FRUEHAUF); | [AD]DE3008787 (ORTHAUS FAHRZEUGWERK [DE]); | [XP]DE3134301 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) |