EP0112507 - Cassette storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEBO/PEERLESS CORPORATION 60 West Street Bloomfield New Jersey 07003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | For all designated states LEBO/PEERLESS CORPORATION 60 West Street Bloomfield New Jersey 07003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stravitz, David M. 16 Park Avenue New York, New York 10016 / US | [1984/27] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111827.8 | 25.11.1983 | [1984/27] | Priority number, date | US19820444795 | 26.11.1982 Original published format: US 444795 | [1984/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112507 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112507 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/02 | [1984/27] | CPC: |
G11B23/0236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/27] | Title | German: | Kassettenbehälter | [1984/27] | English: | Cassette storage device | [1984/27] | French: | Dispositif de rangement de cassette | [1984/27] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 18.12.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/27] | 23.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.10.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU519383 ; | [X]US3848738 (HIRSCH K); | [A]US3743374 (GLASS H); | [A]FR2343311 (GILLIBERT ETS [FR]); | [A]US4285557 (PALADINO ANGELO, et al); | [A]EP0004523 (CLAIRE CORP AG [CH]); | [A]GB2025210 (GILFIN INTERNATIONAL FT LTD); | [AP]US4411481 (BERKMAN JOSEPH L [US]) |