Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] |
24.04.1990 | Change - representative | published on 13.06.1990 [1990/24] |
22.07.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.09.1989 [1989/36] |
16.06.1988 | Change - representative | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] |
25.03.1987 | First examination report | |
29.08.1985 | Publication of search report | published on 30.10.1985 [1985/44] |
03.01.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.1985 [1985/10] |
16.04.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.06.1984 [1984/24] |