Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3244149 | 30.05.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3244149 | 29.11.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3317719 | 22.11.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3317719 | 16.05.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3380538D1 | 12.10.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3244149 | 29.11.1982 | DE3380538 | 25.11.1983 | DE3317719 | 16.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0110349 | Global Dossier | 06.09.1989 | B1 | EP0110349 | 30.10.1985 | A3 | EP0110349 | 13.06.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3244149 | 29.11.1982 | DE3317719 | 16.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4609959 | 02.09.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3244149 | 29.11.1982 | DE3317719 | 16.05.1983 |