EP0110349 - Arrangement for positioning a magnetic head on several tape tracks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA A/S Kjelsasveien 161 Postboks 9 Korsvoll 0808 Oslo 8 / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA A/S Kjelsasveien 161 Postboks 9 Korsvoll N-0808 Oslo 8 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudi, Guttorm Edvard Griegsv. 17 N-1472 Fjellhamar / NO | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/24] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111835.1 | 25.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | DE19823244149 | 29.11.1982 Original published format: DE 3244149 | DE19833317719 | 16.05.1983 Original published format: DE 3317719 | [1984/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0110349 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0110349 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110349 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/55 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
G11B5/5504 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1984/24] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Positionieren eines Magnetkopfs auf verschiedene Spuren eines Magnetbands | [1984/24] | English: | Arrangement for positioning a magnetic head on several tape tracks | [1984/24] | French: | Dispositif pour positionner une tête magnétique sur plusieurs pistes d'une bande | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 30.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP52045915 ; | [A]US3183494 (FRAZER WELSH HERBERT); | [A]EP0011831 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]GB2078434 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [YD]DE3112895 (TANDBERG DATA [NO]) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 1, Nr. 114, 30. September 1977, Seite 4257 E 77; & JP - A - 52 045 915 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 12.04.1977, & JP52045915 A 00000000 |