EP0112511 - New compounds, pharmaceutical preparations containing same and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RORER INTERNATIONAL (OVERSEAS) INC. P.O. Box 145 Lewes, DE 19958 / US | [1989/22] |
Former [1984/27] | For all designated states USV PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION 1 Scarsdale Road Tuckahoe New York / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fu-Chih, Huang 611 Knoll Road Boonton, N.J. / US | 02 /
Jones, Howard 79 Briarcliff Woods Ossining, N.Y. / US | 03 /
Wan-Kit, Chan Parkway Drive Yorktown Heights, N.Y. / US | [1984/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111894.8 | 28.11.1983 | [1984/27] | Priority number, date | US19820445117 | 29.11.1982 Original published format: US 445117 | [1984/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112511 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112511 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112511 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, A61K37/02 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
C07K5/0222 (EP,US);
C07C241/02 (KR);
A61K31/15 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C243/34 (KR);
|
Former IPC [1984/27] | C07C103/52, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/27] | Title | German: | Verbindungen, diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1984/27] | English: | New compounds, pharmaceutical preparations containing same and process for their preparation | [1984/27] | French: | Composés, les préparations pharmaceutiques les contenant et leur procédé de préparation | [1984/27] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 20.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.1989 | BE | 06.09.1989 | FR | 06.09.1989 | IT | 06.09.1989 | NL | 06.09.1989 | GB | 28.11.1989 | SE | 29.11.1989 | CH | 30.11.1989 | LI | 30.11.1989 | LU | 30.11.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 06.09.1989 | |
BE | 06.09.1989 | ||
IT | 06.09.1989 | ||
NL | 06.09.1989 | ||
GB | 28.11.1989 | ||
SE | 29.11.1989 | ||
CH | 30.11.1989 | ||
LI | 30.11.1989 | ||
LU | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 06.09.1989 | |
BE | 06.09.1989 | ||
IT | 06.09.1989 | ||
NL | 06.09.1989 | ||
GB | 28.11.1989 | ||
SE | 29.11.1989 | ||
CH | 30.11.1989 | ||
LI | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1991/12] | AT | 06.09.1989 | |
BE | 06.09.1989 | ||
NL | 06.09.1989 | ||
GB | 28.11.1989 | ||
SE | 29.11.1989 | ||
CH | 30.11.1989 | ||
LI | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/46] | AT | 06.09.1989 | |
NL | 06.09.1989 | ||
GB | 28.11.1989 | ||
SE | 29.11.1989 | ||
CH | 30.11.1989 | ||
LI | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 06.09.1989 | |
NL | 06.09.1989 | ||
GB | 28.11.1989 | ||
SE | 29.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/34] | NL | 06.09.1989 | |
SE | 29.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | NL | 06.09.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0061768 (USV PHARMA CORP [US]); | [AP]US4374829 (HARRIS ELBERT E, et al); | [E]EP0121830 (USV PHARMA CORP [US]) |