EP0114266 - Signalling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NICO-PYROTECHNIK Hanns-Jürgen Diederichs GmbH & Co. KG Bei der Feuerwerkerei 4 D-22946 Trittau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states NICO-PYROTECHNIK Hanns-Jürgen Diederichs GmbH & Co. KG Bei der Feuerwerkerei 4 D-22946 Trittau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diederichs, Hanns-Jürgen, Jr. Möllner Landstrasse 26 D-2077 Grande / DE | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Ralf Holger in Firma Rheinmetall GmbH Ulmenstrasse 125 Postfach 6609 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Behrens, Ralf Holger, Dipl.-Phys. in Firma Rheinmetall GmbH Ulmenstrasse 125 Postfach 6609 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112140.5 | 02.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | DE19833301683 | 20.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3301683 | [1984/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114266 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114266 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114266 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F41C3/02 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
F41A19/53 (EP,US);
F41C3/02 (EP,KR,US);
F41A17/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Signalgerät | [1984/31] | English: | Signalling device | [1984/31] | French: | Dispositif de signalisation | [1984/31] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 19.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1988 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE861659 [ ] (URIARTE JOSE MARTINEZ DE LECEA); | DE1174211 [ ] (ELKE EBERWEIN); | US4266357 [ ] (GREENLEAF JOHN M); | GB1595074 [ ] (SECR DEFENCE) | Examination | US1376165 | FR1158675 | FR1297219 | US3097559 | DE2108010 | DE3107729 |