EP0114272 - Electrochemical storage battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weddigen, Gert, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Max-Reger-Strasse 25 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Kempe, Wolfgang, et al c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr., et al c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | ||
Former [1984/31] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Brown, Boveri & Cie AG Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112233.8 | 06.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | DE19823248076 | 24.12.1982 Original published format: DE 3248076 | [1984/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114272 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114272 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114272 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40, H01M4/60, H01M10/36 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
H01M10/05 (EP,US);
H01M4/60 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Elektrochemische Speicherzelle | [1984/31] | English: | Electrochemical storage battery | [1984/31] | French: | Accumulateur électrochimique | [1984/31] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 06.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0036118 (UNIVERSITY PATENTS INC [US]); | [A]EP0053669 (BASF AG [DE]); | [YP]EP0084642 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Band 103, Nr. 25, 1981, Seiten 7620-7629, American Chemical Society; B.J. COHEN: "The structure of CC-1065, a potent antitumor agent, and its binding to DNA" |