EP0124649 - Bearing arrangement for the rectilinear guiding of a carriage along a guiding rail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1989 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPIRANGA SA Carretera gral. Madrid-Irun KM 456 E-Lasarte/Guipuzcoa / ES | [1987/40] |
Former [1984/46] | For all designated states Neff Gewindespindeln GmbH Alfred-Ritter-Strasse 47 D-7035 Waldenbuch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehmann, Wolfgang, Ing. grad. Nagoldstrasse 97 D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | 02 /
Aab, Hans-Walter Fronackerstrasse 10/1 D-7050 Waiblingen / DE | [1984/46] | Representative(s) | Rüger, Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 73704 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/46] | Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 D-73704 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112389.8 | 09.12.1983 | [1984/46] | Priority number, date | DE19833313128 | 12.04.1983 Original published format: DE 3313128 | [1984/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0124649 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0124649 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0124649 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/06 | [1984/46] | CPC: |
F16C29/0623 (EP,US);
F16C29/004 (EP,US);
F16C29/005 (EP,US);
F16C29/0661 (EP,US);
F16C29/0671 (EP,US);
F16C29/082 (EP,US);
F16C41/007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/46] | Title | German: | Lageranordnung zur geradlinigen Führung eines Schlittens längs einer Führungsschiene | [1984/46] | English: | Bearing arrangement for the rectilinear guiding of a carriage along a guiding rail | [1984/46] | French: | Disposition de palier pour le guidage en ligne droite d'un chariot le long d'un rail guide | [1984/46] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/39] | 18.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 18.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.1987 | LU | 31.12.1987 | NL | 01.07.1988 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/46] | AT | 09.12.1987 | |
NL | 01.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | NL | 01.07.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2136024 (SKF IND TRADING & DEV); | [A]US4363526 (TERAMACHI HIROSHI) |