EP0111345 - Isoxazoles, useful as antiviral agents, and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STERLING DRUG INC. 90 Park Avenue New York New York / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | For all designated states STERLING DRUG INC. 90 Park Avenue New York New York / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diana, Guy Dominic Box 192 Garfield Road East Nassau New York 12062 / US | [1984/25] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112541.4 | 13.12.1983 | [1984/25] | Priority number, date | US19820449060 | 13.12.1982 Original published format: US 449060 | US19830542871 | 17.10.1983 Original published format: US 542871 | [1984/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0111345 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0111345 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D261/08, A61K31/41 | [1984/25] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07D261/00 (KR);
C07D261/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/25] | Title | German: | Isoxazole nützlich als antivirale Mittel und ihre Herstellung | [1984/25] | English: | Isoxazoles, useful as antiviral agents, and preparation thereof | [1984/25] | French: | Isoxazoles utiles comme agents anti-viraux et leurs préparations | [1984/25] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/02] | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2106456 (THOMAE GMBH DR K); | [AD]US4268878 (KEARNS WILLIAM J) | [A] - BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, vol. 46, no. 1, January 1973, pages 310-313, The Chemical Society of Japan, TokyoJP; C. KASHIMA et al.: "The alkylation of 3,5-dimethylisoxazole" |