EP0113895 - Method of laser soldering of flexible wirings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.04.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raisig, Hermann Schuckertstrasse 4 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 02 /
Unger, Gregor, Ing. Grad Otto-Wagner-Strasse 10a D-8034 Germering / DE | 03 /
Wirbser, Oscar, Dipl.-Ing. Kreuzlingerstrasse 73 D-8034 Germering / DE | [1984/30] | Application number, filing date | 83112666.9 | 15.12.1983 | [1984/30] | Priority number, date | DE19823247338 | 21.12.1982 Original published format: DE 3247338 | [1984/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0113895 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H05K3/34, B23K26/00, B23K1/00, H01R43/02 | [1984/30] | CPC: |
H05K3/363 (EP,US);
B23K1/0056 (EP,US);
H01R43/0221 (EP,US);
B23K2101/38 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0108 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1984/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Laserlöten von flexiblen Verdrahtungen | [1984/30] | English: | Method of laser soldering of flexible wirings | [1984/30] | French: | Procédé pour la soudure laser du câblage flexible | [1984/30] | File destroyed: | 30.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/07] | 06.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/25] | 31.01.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3657508 (STUDNICK WILLIAM R); | [A]EP0019186 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AP]US4404453 (GOTMAN ALEXANDER [US]) |