EP0114316 - Test means, test device and method for determining the ionic strength or specific gravity of a liquid sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/31] | Novel quaternary ammonium polyelectrolyte salts, test means, test device and method for determining the ionic strength or specific gravity of a liquid sample | ||
[1987/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.1988 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.1988 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Joseph Y. 1501 Locust Street Apt. 207 Elkhart IN 46514 / US | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Dänner, Klaus, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Rechtspolitik Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | Dänner, Klaus, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1984/31] | Senftl, Hannes, Dr. c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-5090 Leverkusen Bayerwerk / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112689.1 | 16.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | US19820453874 | 27.12.1982 Original published format: US 453874 | US19820453297 | 27.12.1982 Original published format: US 453297 | [1984/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114316 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114316 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114316 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/493, G01N33/52, G01N9/00 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/52 (EP);
G01N9/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/35] | G01N33/52, G01N9/00 | ||
Former IPC [1984/31] | G01N33/50, G01N9/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Testmittel, Testgerät und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Ionenstärke oder des spezifischen Gewichtes einer wässrigen Probe | [1987/40] | English: | Test means, test device and method for determining the ionic strength or specific gravity of a liquid sample | [1987/40] | French: | Moyen d'examen, appareillage d'examen et méthode de détermination de la force ionique ou du poids spécifique d'un échantillon liquide | [1987/40] |
Former [1984/31] | Quaternäre Ammonium-Polyelektrolyt-Salze, Testmittel, Testgerät und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Ionenstärke oder des spezifischen Gewichtes einer wässrigen Probe | ||
Former [1984/31] | Novel quaternary ammonium polyelectrolyte salts, test means, test device and method for determining the ionic strength or specific gravity of a liquid sample | ||
Former [1984/31] | Sels polyélectrolytiques d'ammonium quaternaire, moyen d'examen, appareillage d'examen et méthode de détermination de la force ionique ou du poids spécifique d'un échantillon liquide | Examination procedure | 16.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/31] | 24.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 30.09.1987 | [1989/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4318709 ; | [Y]EP0023631 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 84, no. 22, 31st May 1976, page 16, no. 151195c, Columbus, Ohio, USA; E. TSUCHIDA et al.: "Gel formation through interpolymer interaction of poly(methacrylic acid)-poly(vinylbenzyltrimethylammonium chloride" & J. POLYM. SCI., POLYM. CHEM. ED. 1976, 14(3), 76 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 18, 2nd November 1981, page 11, no. 151300k, Columbus, Ohio, USA; B. PHILIPP et al.: "Polysalt formation with poly(carboxylic acid)s" & EUR. POLYM. J. 1981, 17(6), 615-618 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 23, 9th December 1974, page 24, no. 153025j, Columbus, Ohio, USA; ZH.G. GULYAEVA et al.: "Polyelectrolyte complexes consisting of polymeric quaternary ammonium salts"& VYSOKOMOL. SOEDIN., SER. A 1974, 16(8), 1852-1858 | Examination | US3325402 | US3429963 | US2984639 | US4320040 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 22, 30th November 1981, page 12, no. 187841b, Columbus, Ohio, USA; |