EP0112557 - Process for producing a polyurethane elastomer by reaction injection molding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. No. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1984/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Narisawa, Shigeyuki No. 106, Nishi-Takenomaru Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Funaki, Masahiko 2-5-57, Matsugaoka Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Hiroaki 3-51-1, Hashido Seya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kuga, Kazuhiko 875-4, Mamedo-cho Kohhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1984/27] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112931.7 | 21.12.1983 | [1984/27] | Priority number, date | JP19820225784 | 24.12.1982 Original published format: JP 22578482 | JP19830060985 | 08.04.1983 Original published format: JP 6098583 | [1984/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112557 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112557 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C08G18/32, C08G18/14, B29D27/00, B60R19/02 | [1984/27] | CPC: |
C08G18/4837 (EP,US);
C08G18/4841 (EP,US);
C08G18/4866 (EP,US);
C08G18/667 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Polyurethanelastomers nach dem Reaktionsspritzgiessverfahren | [1984/27] | English: | Process for producing a polyurethane elastomer by reaction injection molding | [1984/27] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un élastomère de polyuréthane par moulage par injection réaction | [1984/27] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 21.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.1988 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/53] | 06.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/53] | Appeal following examination | 20.11.1989 | Appeal received No. T0112/90 | 30.01.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.10.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE657706 ; | [A]FR2491932 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | [A]US3461086 (MOGFORD RILEY F, et al); | [A]EP0044481 (MOBAY CHEMICAL CORP [US]); | [A]BE655757 ; | [X]FR2283917 (UPJOHN CO [US]) |