EP0112561 - Aqueous electroplating solutions and process for electrolytically plating palladium-silver alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LeaRonal, Inc. 272 Buffalo Avenue Freeport, N.Y. 11520 / US | [1984/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nobel, Fred I. Plum Beach Point Rd. Sands Point New York / US | [1984/27] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112994.5 | 22.12.1983 | [1984/27] | Priority number, date | US19820452144 | 22.12.1982 Original published format: US 452144 | US19830561152 | 15.12.1983 Original published format: US 561152 | [1984/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0112561 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112561 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/56 | [1984/27] | CPC: |
C25D3/567 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/27] | Title | German: | Wässrige Elektroplattierlösungen und Verfahren für das Elektroplattieren von Palladium-Silber-Legierungen | [1984/27] | English: | Aqueous electroplating solutions and process for electrolytically plating palladium-silver alloys | [1984/27] | French: | Solutions de dépôt électrolytique aqueuses et procédé de dépôt électrolytique d'alliages palladium-argent | [1984/27] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 30.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU278342 ; | GB2062683 [ ] (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | USB435844I [ ] | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, volume 7, no. 3, August 1964, (US) J.V. POWERS et al. "Bath for the preparation of silver-palladium alloys", page 177 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, volume 74, no. 4, February 22, 1971, page 468, abstract 37809z (COLUMBUS, OHIO, US) & SU - A - 278 342 (MENDELEEV D.I. CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGICAL INSTITUTE, MOSCOW) 05-08-1970, & SU278342 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, volume 80, no. 8, February 25, 1974, page 441, abstract 43402b (COLUMBUS, OHIO, US) B.M. KRAMER "Electroplating of a silver-palladium alloy from a pyrophosphate-thiocyanate bath", & Zh. Prikl. Khim. (Leningrad) 1973, 46(10), 2326-8 | [A] - H.W. DETTNER and J. ELZE "HANDBUCH DER GALVANOTECHNIK", volume II, 1966, CARL HANSER VERLAG (MUNICH, DE) page 435 | Examination | WO8202908 |