EP0113113 - Cathode ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.1988 [1988/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matsushita Electronics Corporation 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | For all designated states Matsushita Electronics Corporation 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Hiroshi 11-4, Izumigaoka Nagaokakyo City, 617 / JP | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/28] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt P.O. Box 40 14 68 Clemensstrasse 30 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83113068.7 | 23.12.1983 | [1984/28] | Priority number, date | JP19820234129 | 29.12.1982 Original published format: JP 23412982 | JP19820234130 | 29.12.1982 Original published format: JP 23413082 | JP19830122514 | 05.07.1983 Original published format: JP 12251483 | [1984/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0113113 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0113113 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/48, H01J29/62 | [1984/28] | CPC: |
H01J29/488 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1984/28] | Title | German: | Kathodenstrahlröhre | [1984/28] | English: | Cathode ray tube | [1984/28] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodiques | [1984/28] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 16.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3036238 ; | [X]DE2850656 ; | [A]US4334170 ; | [A]US2902623 ; | [A]US2971108 |