EP0112582 - Superposed image display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1988 [1988/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umemura, Yoshiyuki 1 Matsumura-Apartment 401-20, Nishinasuno-machi Nasu-gun Tochigi-ken / JP | [1984/27] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83113151.1 | 27.12.1983 | [1984/27] | Priority number, date | JP19820234028 | 27.12.1982 Original published format: JP 23402882 | JP19820233519 | 28.12.1982 Original published format: JP 23351982 | JP19820233537 | 28.12.1982 Original published format: JP 23353782 | [1984/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0112582 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112582 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B8/00 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
G01R33/56 (EP,US);
H04N5/3205 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/27] | A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1984/27] | Title | German: | Sichtgerät für Überlagerungsbilder | [1984/27] | English: | Superposed image display device | [1984/27] | French: | Dispositif de visualisation d'images superposées | [1984/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/27] | 12.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2030698 (RADIOLOGIE CIE GLE); | [X]US3848130 (MACOVSKI A); | [X]US4029963 (ALVAREZ ROBERT E, et al); | [X]DE2431272 (MEDICOR MUEVEK); | [X]FR2055507 (SPITALUL COPII CALARASI); | [X]FR2379274 (FLAVIER MARC [FR]); | [A]DE2950780 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4157572 (KENNEDY WILLIAM H [US], et al); | [A]US4350998 (VERHOEVEN LEONARDUS A J) | [A] - MEDICAL PROGRESS THROUGH TECHNOLOGY, vol. 1, no. 3, December 1972, pages 115-124, Springer-Verlag | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, vol. NS-29, no. 3, June 1982, pages 1076-1086, IEEE, New York, US |