EP0084901 - Container made of laminated paperboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.09.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1988 | Opposition rejected | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAN LEER VERPACKUNGEN G.M.B.H. Mönckebergstrasse 19 D-2000 Hamburg / DE | [1983/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junge, Norbert Ernst August van Goghplatz 2 D-521 Troisdorf / DE | 02 /
Kraan, Gerrit Hüchel Busstrasse 9 D-5202 Hennef 41 / DE | [1983/31] | Representative(s) | van der Beek, George F., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/31] | van der Beek, George Frans, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 83200051.7 | 13.01.1983 | [1983/31] | Priority number, date | DE19823202033 | 20.01.1982 Original published format: DE 3202033 | [1983/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084901 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084901 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65D3/28 | [1983/31] | CPC: |
B65D3/28 (EP,US);
B31C1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/31] | Title | German: | Behälter aus einem Laminat von Faserschichten | [1983/31] | English: | Container made of laminated paperboard | [1983/31] | French: | Récipient realisé à partir d'un laminé de couches fibreuses | [1985/42] |
Former [1983/31] | Récipient en materiaux laminés de feuilles fibreuses | Examination procedure | 23.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/10] | 19.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.07.1986
01.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Thelen, Johann Jahnstrasse 17 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | [1986/36] | 26.09.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.01.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.02.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1988 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.06.1988 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB621262 (RUPERT PETER PETERS); | [Y]GB404529 (GIDEON RICHIE KREIDER JUNIOR); | [Y]NL278954 ; | [A]US1923426 (EGGERSS HANS A); | [A]US1362090 (HENRY DRYSDALE); | [A]US1904365 (GEIST WILLIAM J) | Examination | CH406825 |