Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3360995D1 | 21.11.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3202033 | 20.01.1982 | DE3360995 | 13.01.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU551943B | Global Dossier | 15.05.1986 | B2 | AU1059283 | 28.07.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3202033 | 20.01.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0084901 | Global Dossier | 16.10.1985 | B1 | EP0084901 | 03.08.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3202033 | 20.01.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8300268 | 25.10.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3202033 | 20.01.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK152271C | 11.07.1988 | C | DK152271B | 15.02.1988 | B | DK20883 | 21.07.1983 | A | DK20883D0 | 19.01.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE3202033 | 20.01.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI73400C | 09.10.1987 | C | FI73400B | 30.06.1987 | B | FI830168L | 21.07.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3202033 | 20.01.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ203057 | 12.07.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3202033 | 20.01.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4462536 | 31.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3202033 | 20.01.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA83386 | 26.10.1983 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3202033 | 20.01.1982 |