EP0086524 - Improvements in squeeze rolls for sheet materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.1986 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.1986 [1986/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bianco, Mario Loc. Vaccheria, 7/2 I-12051 Alba (CN) / IT | [1983/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/34] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/34] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 83200172.1 | 01.02.1983 | [1983/34] | Priority number, date | IT19820067170 | 15.02.1982 Original published format: IT 6717082 | [1983/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0086524 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0086524 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B30B3/04 | [1983/34] | CPC: |
B30B3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/34] | Title | German: | Pressrollen für Folienmaterial | [1983/34] | English: | Improvements in squeeze rolls for sheet materials | [1983/34] | French: | Rouleaux de pressage pour matériaux en feuille | [1983/34] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 29.08.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/10] | 27.09.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2762295 [ ] (ANDRE VARGA, et al); | US3273199 [ ] (JAN KLEINEWEFERS); | DE1928770 [ ] (FMC CORP); | FR2107072 [ ] (NEUMUENSTER MASCH APP); | US4348952 [ ] (GOOCH KENDRICK J) |