EP0087837 - Apparatus for printing information on a record carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
S.A. d'etudes et Realisations Nucleaires - SODERN 10, rue de la Passerelle 92150 Suresnes / FR | For:DE
GB
IT
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | For:FR
S.A. d'etudes et Realisations Nucleaires - SODERN 10, rue de la Passerelle F-92150 Suresnes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cassanas Claude SOCIETE CIVILE S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Couot, Jean-Pierre SOCIETE CIVILE S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 03 /
Royer, Jacques SOCIETE CIVILE S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Pyronnet, Jacques Victor Joseph, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Pyronnet, Jacques, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83200261.2 | 21.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | FR19820003235 | 26.02.1982 Original published format: FR 8203235 | [1983/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087837 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087837 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087837 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41K3/14 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
B41K3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Apparat zum Aufzeichnen von Informationen auf einem Informationsträger | [1983/36] | English: | Apparatus for printing information on a record carrier | [1983/36] | French: | Appareil pour le marquage d'informations sur un support d'informations | [1983/36] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 07.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4054090 (LOFTUS PETER J [US], et al) |