EP0090469 - Process to separate nitrogen from natural gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1987 [1987/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swallow, Brian Robert 1295 N. Providence Road Apt. D-301 Media Pennsylvania 19073 / US | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | van der Beek, George F., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | van der Beek, George Frans, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 83200422.0 | 25.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | US19820362048 | 26.03.1982 Original published format: US 362048 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0090469 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0090469 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0090469 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/08, F25J3/02 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
F25J3/0257 (EP,US);
F25J3/0209 (EP,US);
F25J3/0233 (EP,US);
F25J2200/02 (EP,US);
F25J2200/04 (EP,US);
F25J2200/06 (EP,US);
F25J2200/72 (EP,US);
F25J2200/76 (EP,US);
F25J2200/78 (EP,US);
F25J2205/04 (EP,US);
F25J2220/64 (EP,US);
F25J2235/60 (EP,US);
F25J2245/02 (EP,US);
F25J2270/02 (EP,US);
F25J2270/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | GB, NL [1983/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Trennen von Stickstoff von Erdgas | [1983/40] | English: | Process to separate nitrogen from natural gas | [1983/40] | French: | Procédé de séparation de l'azote du gaz naturel | [1983/40] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/12] | 23.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2583090 (COST JOE L); | [A]US3238735 (SIEWERT HOWARD R); | [A]US3780534 (LOFREDO A, et al) |