EP0089097 - Sample spinning mechanism for NMR probes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.1983 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARIAN ASSOCIATES, INC. 611 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [1983/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hill, Howard David Wilson 7951 Folkestone Drive Cupertino California / US | 02 /
Huber, Ulrich 10700 Carver Drive Cupertino California / US | [1983/38] | Representative(s) | Cline, Roger Ledlie, et al STANLEY, POPPLEWELL, POOLE 57 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | Cline, Roger Ledlie, et al STANLEY, POPPLEWELL, POOLE 57 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 83200494.9 | 20.05.1980 | [1983/38] | Priority number, date | US19790042821 | 29.05.1979 Original published format: US 42821 | [1983/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0089097 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0089097 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/04 | [1983/46] | CPC: |
G01R33/307 (EP,US);
Y10S505/844 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/38] | G01N24/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1983/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Drehen einer Probe für Sonden der kernmagnetischen Resonanz | [1983/38] | English: | Sample spinning mechanism for NMR probes | [1983/38] | French: | Dispositif pour tourner un échantillon pour sondes à résonance magnétique nucléaire | [1983/38] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/38] | 20.12.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP80301683.1 / EP0020085 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3038115 (MUELLER WILLIAM F); | [A]FR2106222 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES); | [A]US3681683 (HUBER ULRICH); | [Y]DE2743943 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES); | [Y]FR2393304 (INST KIB AKADEMII [SU]); | [AP]EP0009535 (IBM [US]) |