EP0092284 - Method and system for data transmission on a power line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.1988 [1988/39] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
RTC-COMPELEC 130, Avenue Ledru-Rollin F-75011 Paris / FR | For:CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | For:FR
RTC-COMPELEC 130, Avenue Ledru-Rollin F-75011 Paris / FR | ||
For:CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1983/43] | For:FR
R.T.C. LA RADIOTECHNIQUE-COMPELEC Société anonyme dite: 51 rue Carnot F-92150 Suresnes(Hauts-de-Seine) / FR | ||
For:CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Six, Jean-Claude Gérard SPID 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1983/43] | Representative(s) | Caron, Jean, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | Caron, Jean, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1983/43] | Pinchon, Pierre Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83200538.3 | 15.04.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | FR19820006590 | 16.04.1982 Original published format: FR 8206590 | [1983/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0092284 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0092284 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092284 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54, B60R16/02 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
H04B3/548 (EP);
H04B2203/5416 (EP);
H04B2203/5425 (EP);
H04B2203/5458 (EP);
H04B2203/547 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Datenübertragung über eine Energieversorgungsleitung | [1983/43] | English: | Method and system for data transmission on a power line | [1983/43] | French: | Procédé et système de transmission de données sur une ligne d'alimentation | [1983/43] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 27.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2403695 ; | [A]GB2075314 ; | [AD]FR2460573 |