EP0096450 - Electrophotographic copier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1987 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1987 [1987/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ing. C. Olivetti & C., S.p.A. Via G. Jervis 77 10015 Ivrea (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | For all designated states Ing. C. Olivetti & C., S.p.A. Via G. Jervis 77 I-10015 Ivrea (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cestari, Bruno Borgata Paradiso Via Buonarroti 2 I-10093 Collegno (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Forlani, Riccardo Cosro Bernardino Telesio 40 I-40146 Torino / IT | 03 /
Gontero, Piero Cascina Martinette I-10012 Bollengo Torino / IT | [1983/51] | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1983/51] | Application number, filing date | 83200851.0 | 10.02.1982 | [1983/51] | Priority number, date | IT19810067250 | 24.02.1981 Original published format: IT 6725081 | [1983/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096450 | Date: | 21.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096450 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [1983/51] | CPC: |
G03G15/0928 (EP);
G03G15/2092 (EP);
G03G15/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1983/51] | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches Kopiergerät | [1983/51] | English: | Electrophotographic copier | [1983/51] | French: | Copieur électrophotographique | [1983/51] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/22] | 12.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82300666.3 / EP0060030 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.1986 | [1987/20] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2198180 ; | [AP]WO8101060 ; | [A]US4200389 | Examination | EP0039361 |